ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH SMITH

Charity number: 210463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 October 2016 On time Download