ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH SMITH

Charity number: 210463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £64.08k £64.55k £65.72k £77.35k £67.55k
Total expenditure £61.22k £46.56k £42.61k £51.70k £48.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A