Trustees THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS OF LONDON
Charity number: 210508

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Dean | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ananthakrishnan Raghuram | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anne Marie Millar | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Simon Bowman | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Professor Ramesh Pulendran Arasaradnam | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Cathryn Mary Edwards | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Joanna Szram | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sarah Catherine Clarke | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||||
Professor David Croisdale-Appleby | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Charles Baden-Fuller | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.