Trustees ROYAL INSTITUTE OF BRITISH ARCHITECTS
Charity number: 210566

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Brown Pringle | Chair | 07 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
Sumita Singha OBE | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Andrew Benford | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Patricia Boon | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Dixon | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Allford | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Simone de Gale | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Paul Devine | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Marjorie Ann Strachan | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Hermione Seager Bacon | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Mary Anne Victoria Stevens | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Murray Leonard Orr | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.