ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT NORTH WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 210633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £203.61k £206.71k £212.71k £207.08k £173.81k
Total expenditure £168.97k £169.89k £302.78k £178.13k £135.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £49.77k