The London Rifles Volunteer Trusts

Charity number: 210638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required