Financial history BRITISH GOAT SOCIETY

Charity number: 210646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £71.90k £71.53k £73.41k £68.86k £71.82k
Total expenditure £73.86k £76.82k £84.99k £80.03k £75.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A