Financial history LIONEL ANNESLEY DORANT FOR ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 210687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £156.33k £176.44k £168.84k £148.27k £144.45k
Total expenditure £81.56k £80.71k £158.19k £86.65k £123.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A