Financial history THE ROYAL UNITED KINGDOM BENEFICENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 210729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.12m £9.88m £9.10m £8.69m £7.35m
Total expenditure £11.55m £16.68m £18.51m £16.56m £12.47m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £83.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.45m £4.68m £3.38m £4.11m £3.49m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £199.00k £179.00k £109.00k
Income - Charitable activities £30.00k £94.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.61m £5.09m £5.49m £4.32m £3.74m
Income - Other £31.00k £12.00k £33.00k £69.00k £10.00k
Income - Legacies £783.00k £3.03m £909.00k £865.00k £1.47m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.72m £13.87m £14.89m £14.23m £10.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.78m £2.80m £3.62m £2.33m £1.94m
Expenditure - Governance £57.00k £83.00k £119.00k £79.00k £88.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.38m £1.08m
Expenditure - Investment management £458.00k £313.00k £222.00k £274.00k £284.00k
Expenditure - Other £47.00k £6.00k £0 £0 £0