CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT BRANCH OF THE RSPCA

Charity number: 210743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time Download