CLARITY - EMPLOYMENT FOR BLIND PEOPLE

Charity number: 210794
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019
Annual return 31 March 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2016 On time Download