CLARITY - EMPLOYMENT FOR BLIND PEOPLE

Charity number: 210794
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £2.93m £2.92m £2.61m £2.77m £2.60m
Total expenditure £3.17m £3.22m £3.19m £3.27m £3.39m
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £515.53k £490.16k £475.84k £457.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £148.38k £196.08k £139.67k £96.30k £84.75k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.45m £2.42m £2.38m £2.39m £2.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £333.94k £299.14k £82.49k £85.07k £75.44k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £196.25k £0
Income - Legacies £30.24k £88.28k £40.70k £5.00k £6.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.15m £3.20m £3.19m £3.27m £3.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.00k £18.25k £17.85k £13.76k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £83.00k £0 £0