NUFFIELD TRUST FOR THE FORCES OF THE CROWN

Charity number: 210829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £650.74k £579.20k £642.75k £633.77k £1.28m
Total expenditure £1.06m £2.95m £2.15m £2.89m £2.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £598.64k £579.20k £642.75k £633.77k £87.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.08m £1.19m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £2.95m £2.11m £2.89m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £47.23k £0 £21.88k
Expenditure - Governance £100.19k £106.02k £92.53k £72.49k £68.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £959.90k £2.85m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management -£52.11k -£79.81k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0