NUFFIELD TRUST FOR THE FORCES OF THE CROWN

Charity number: 210829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vice Admiral Sir David Steel KBE DL Trustee 24 November 2015 None on record
Sir Mark Mans KCB CBE DL Trustee 15 April 2013 None on record
MR DAVID ROSIER Trustee None on record
Lord Arbuthnot Chair 21 March 2017 None on record
Air Marshal Sir Baz North KCB OBE Trustee 21 November 2017 None on record
Lord Christopher Geidt GCBGCVOOBE Trustee 18 March 2019 None on record