Trustees UNITED MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 210992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kristina Denys Amos Chair 13 March 2018
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Rev Brian McHenry CBE Trustee 13 June 2023
CANTERBURY COMMEMORATION SOCIETY
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Lesley Anne Thomas Trustee 03 November 2020
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Jennifer Forster Trustee 03 November 2020
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Ruth Harrison Sibson Trustee 06 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST PAUL, CANTERBURY
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Andrew Gilbert Webster FCA DChA Trustee 13 March 2018
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
EWIN'S SUNDAY SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SAMUEL DANIEL EWINS
Received: On time
REVEREND CHARLES HAIRBY BARTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CANTERBURY CHRISTIAN COUNCIL LIMITED
Received: On time
UNITED KINGDOM NATIONAL COMMITTEE OF THE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES
Overdue by 144 days
INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL ON MONUMENTS AND SITES, UK
Received: On time
Philip Fidler Trustee 05 September 2017
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
CLIVE GRAHAM BOWLEY Trustee
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAYNARD AND COTTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time