Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY
Charity number: 211014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gopichand Katragadda PhD FIET | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mamta Rani Singhal MBE FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yewande Modupe Akinola MBE FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Warren Arthur East CBE FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon David Hart CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Andrew James Rogers CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Elizabeth Ohlson CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Timothy Richard Dafforn FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Elizabeth Hubbard IEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carol Marsh CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronjon Nag CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anni Feng CEng MIET | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Deacon CEng MIET | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Sarah Hutty CEng MIET | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Katherine Spurgeon CEng FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Anthony Cryan CBE FIET | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.