PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION

Charity number: 211025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 April 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download