HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST

Charity number: 211053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 APRIL 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 20 MARCH 1961, 1 MARCH 1973, 8 MAY 1985
Charitable objects
1) PAYMENT OF WEEKLY ALLOWANCES TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YAERS OF AGE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2) BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE OF THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT THE FORMER BOROUGH OF EALING. 3) SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF EALING AND LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING
Registration history
  • 02 November 1962 : Standard registration
  • 13 February 2001 : Removed
  • 13 February 2001 : Asset transfer out