Financial history GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT

Charity number: 211060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £213.30k £180.72k £202.05k £195.44k £196.06k
Total expenditure £383.15k £228.29k £140.33k £143.41k £252.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A