Trustees GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT

Charity number: 211060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL ANDREW KNIGHTS Chair 20 March 2017
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Peter Armitage Trustee 13 February 2024
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Graham Mothersole Trustee 01 June 2023
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Robinson Trustee 01 December 2022
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
Susan Glossop Trustee 07 June 2022
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
WEST STOW SAXON VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
SIR JOHN WOOD, HENGRAVE AND FLEMPTON TRUST
Received: On time
Patrick Hung Chow Chung Trustee 01 June 2022
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
Thomas Matthew Murray Trustee 01 December 2021
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Birgitte Mager Trustee 01 June 2021
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
VIRGINIA BEVERLEY DEAN Trustee 02 March 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
Mark Merriam Trustee 03 March 2020
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
George Edward James COCKRAM Trustee 16 October 2019
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Joseph Patricius Hawes Trustee 04 September 2018
OLD SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
Gregory Luton Trustee 06 June 2018
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
Hannah BLACK Trustee 07 March 2010
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS Trustee
THE LITTLE GIDDING TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST
Overdue by 204 days
THE ICKWORTH CHURCH CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
THE DAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GENERAL THE HONOURABLE SIR WILLIAM HERVEY
Overdue by 107 days
HENRY REGINALD SALTMARSH FCA Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES
Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON
Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SUSAN GAINSBOROUGH SOPER Trustee
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time