Accounts and annual returns DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 211062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 January 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required