THE KINGSDOWNE SOCIETY

Charity number: 211069
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015
Total gross income £490.07k £460.72k £498.71k £529.83k £536.23k
Total expenditure £470.24k £479.96k £468.51k £514.42k £570.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £131.76k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £218 £6.54k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £526.68k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £527.71k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.90k £3.01k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £510.07k £567.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.92k £1.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.43k £1.09k