Accounts and annual returns THE PLOUGHLET CHARITY

Charity number: 211158
Charity reporting is overdue by 1696 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 600 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 965 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1330 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1330 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1696 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window