Financial history ARMENIAN CHURCH OF ST SARKIS

Charity number: 211230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £157.21k £177.66k £129.79k £91.02k £104.17k
Total expenditure £131.69k £172.89k £107.18k £108.47k £114.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £28.57k £32.27k