Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE'S HALL

Charity number: 211313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 February 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 February 2024 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 February 2024 742 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2024 1107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1635 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1635 days