Financial history PARISH OF POPLAR BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.48k £2.65k £3.71k £3.74k £3.77k
Total expenditure £3.25k £750 £2.30k £5.88k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A