Financial history THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 211409
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £590.03k £611.83k £641.84k £641.09k £671.32k
Total expenditure £593.82k £495.06k £546.83k £710.90k £630.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £590.03k £611.83k £641.84k £641.09k £671.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £343.83k £325.00k £326.00k £315.00k £380.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £249.99k £158.83k £196.19k £389.27k £230.86k
Expenditure - Governance £4.44k £5.16k £0 £6.63k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £338.00k £0 £0 £0 £380.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £4.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £11.23k £24.64k £6.63k £19.57k