VISION SUPPORT HARROGATE DISTRICT

Charity number: 211436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT HORNER Chair None on record
David Fisher Trustee 03 November 2017 None on record
James Alfred Grimshaw Trustee 03 November 2003 None on record
Stephen John Kirk Trustee 08 November 2019
WAKEFIELD DISTRICT SIGHT AID Received: On time
Peter Charles Jensen Trustee 08 November 2019 None on record
John Macrae Mellor Trustee 21 October 2016 None on record
Alistair William Ratcliffe Trustee 03 November 2017
HARROGATE AND AREA CVS LTD Received: On time
Mary Elizabeth Kirk Trustee 09 November 2018
NIDD VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Sara Lisabeth Horbury Trustee 21 December 2020 None on record
ERIC MITCHELL Trustee
ROTARY CLUB OF HARROGATE TRUST FUND Received: On time