BELCHAMP ST PAUL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 211460
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.80k £12.73k £11.75k £14.43k £25.63k
Total expenditure £20.40k £15.60k £12.24k £29.52k £10.55k
Income from government contracts £300 £300 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £400 £71 £15.41k