Accounts and annual returns THE ROGER AND SARAH BANCROFT CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 211513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 November 2019 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 November 2019 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 January 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 February 2019 105 days late Download Open in new window