Accounts and annual returns FOLKESTONE MUNICIPAL CHARITY

Charity number: 211528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window