Financial history THE S H MAKEPEACE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 211532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.12k £3.12k £2.74k £2.49k £2.51k
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.00k £1.50k £2.38k £3.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A