SELDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 211536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time Download