THE POLLARD COTTAGES

Charity number: 211545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DERRICK ASHLEY Trustee
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN EDUCATION FOUNDATION Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev Christopher Bunce Trustee 04 November 2019
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
JOAN KIRBY Chair
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
MICHAEL BRADLY RUSSELL Trustee
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
DAVID WALMSLEY Trustee
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
BRENT SMITH Trustee
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN TOWN HALL LIMITED Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
RICHARD THAKE Trustee 01 June 2018
HERTFORDSHIRE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
Ian Albert Trustee 06 April 2016
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
CSIS CHARITY FUND Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES COLLISON Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
HITCHIN COW COMMONERS TRUST Received: On time
Joan Joe Trustee 17 June 2019
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time
Cllr Terry Tyler Trustee 10 July 2017
FARMER TRUST Received: On time
HITCHIN UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
HITCHIN APPRENTICING FOUNDATION Received: On time