CROWBOROUGH ST JOHN'S WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 211556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required