CROWBOROUGH ST JOHN'S WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 211556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £7.04k £7.00k £7.43k £7.13k £13.49k
Total expenditure £8.39k £7.79k £5.76k £6.41k £4.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k