ST LUKE CHARLTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 211564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 September 2020 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 December 2018 36 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 December 2016 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required