ST LUKE CHARLTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 211564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £16.04k £14.09k £32.55k £13.62k £26.04k
Total expenditure £10.13k £6.89k £36.55k £37.95k £50.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A