Financial history HONOURABLE SOCIETY OF MASTERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £6.14k £5.84k £6.37k £5.36k £6.10k
Total expenditure £3.37k £2.83k £15.75k £0 £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A