Accounts and annual returns JOHN MENZIES (SOUTHERN) LIMITED EMPLOYEES' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 211621
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2022 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2021 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required