Accounts and annual returns INNER LONDON SCOPE GROUP

Charity number: 211704
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2020 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required