Financial history INNER LONDON SCOPE GROUP

Charity number: 211704
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £595 £1.26k £1.44k £502 £0
Total expenditure £1.29k £1.88k £1.45k £551 £990
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A