Trustees POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST

Charity number: 211762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernadette O'Shea Chair 01 January 2015
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
George Barrow Trustee 01 January 2023
THE CABBAGE TRUST
Received: On time
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Oliver Griffiths Trustee 01 October 2022
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Anne Wilkinson Trustee 01 October 2022
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
John Smith Trustee 14 March 2021
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Denise James- Mason Trustee 01 January 2021
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Charles Trustee 01 January 2020
LONDON WEST AREA QUAKER MEETING
Received: On time
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Linda Craig Trustee 01 January 2020
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Jenny Moy Trustee 01 January 2019
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Daniels Trustee 01 January 2019
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Randal Barker Trustee 01 January 2019
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Martin Trustee 01 January 2017
LONDON QUAKERS PROPERTY TRUST
Received: On time