ST OLAVE, ST THOMAS AND ST JOHN UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 211763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 18 November 2016 On time Download