ST OLAVE, ST THOMAS AND ST JOHN UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 211763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £484.05k £520.73k £547.27k £581.55k £587.72k
Total expenditure £427.09k £550.99k £604.11k £602.00k £605.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £8.00k £8.00k £8.85k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £512.73k £539.27k £572.70k £571.72k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £16.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £550.99k £604.11k £537.95k £506.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £61.12k £64.13k £64.05k £64.31k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.00k £9.30k £9.60k £9.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £28.10k £42.50k £59.17k £36.32k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £61.12k £64.13k £64.05k £64.31k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £561.61k £0 £34.74k