Trustees ST OLAVE, ST THOMAS AND ST JOHN UNITED CHARITY
Charity number: 211763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIOLA OLATUNJI | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN TURNER | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naima Ali | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|||||
MARIA CHEESEMAN | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BROWN | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucas Green | Trustee | 27 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Parsons | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Scorer | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bates | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BENSON | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRANK GILLMAN | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.