Trustees ROYAL OPERA HOUSE COVENT GARDEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 211775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janis Elizabeth Susskind Trustee 05 October 2022
BRITTEN SINFONIA LTD
Received: On time
Britten Pears Arts
Received: On time
THE LONDON SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA LIMITED
Received: On time
Lisa Jane Burger Trustee 05 October 2022
HISTORIC ROYAL PALACES
Received: On time
Vanessa Kingori Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Sir Alex Younger Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Michael Ward Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Caroline Louise Britton Trustee 14 December 2021
THE ROYAL OPERA HOUSE ENDOWMENT FUND 2000
Received: On time
Christopher Townsend Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Indhu Rubasingham MBE Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Lord John Browne Trustee 01 September 2020
THE SAMUEL COURTAULD TRUST
Received: On time
Zeinab Badawi-Malik Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
TIMOTHY BRIAN BUNTING Trustee 03 October 2017
THE SUTTON TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL OPERA HOUSE ENDOWMENT FUND 2000
Received: On time
Susan Hoyle Trustee 01 September 2017
FUEL PRODUCTIONS LTD
Received: On time
Kirstine Ann Cooper Trustee 04 October 2016
None on record
PAUL DRING MORRELL OBE Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Sir Lloyd Dorfman CBE Trustee 10 February 2015
None on record
DANIEL CHARLES WYLER Trustee 17 October 2014
None on record