E S G ROBINSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 211848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 February 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 February 2019 3 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download