ST BARTHOLOMEW'S GATEHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 211859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.43k £9.38k £9.38k £13.27k £10.63k
Total expenditure £1.98k £3.35k £3.35k £11.75k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A