Financial history THE BEATRICE LAING TRUST

Charity number: 211884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £3.06m £2.60m £2.74m £2.34m £2.87m
Total expenditure £2.42m £2.29m £2.34m £3.03m £2.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £229.00k £119.50k £138.00k £186.75k £106.55k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.84m £2.48m £2.61m £2.15m £2.76m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.42m £2.29m £2.28m £2.83m £2.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.20k £1.28k £61.89k £201.23k £231.34k
Expenditure - Governance £20.81k £22.91k £23.69k £22.69k £23.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.34m £2.18m £2.16m £2.73m £2.13m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.20k £1.28k £61.89k £201.23k £231.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0